VA HB244 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 30 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-10 - Stricken from docket by Courts of Justice by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 30 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-10 - Stricken from docket by Courts of Justice by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Nuisance; property where breach of peace recurs. Defines as a "nuisance" any property where repeated breaches of the peace occur and authorizes any person to maintain a civil action to enjoin the maintenance of the nuisance. The bill provides that a bond will be required if the complainant is a private person and sets out procedures for service of notice, requirement of a hearing on an application for a preliminary injunction, and conduct of the trial in an action seeking a permanent injunction. The bill allows the court to consolidate the trial with the hearing on the application for a preliminary injunction and makes evidence of the general reputation of the building and its occupants admissible in proving the existence of a nuisance. Finally, the bill establishes liability for later owners who fail to abate a continuing nuisance and allows the attorney for a locality to commence a forfeiture action if an order of abatement of a nuisance is violated.
Title
Nuisance; property where breach of peace recurs.
Sponsors
Del. Jeion Ward [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-10 | House | Stricken from docket by Courts of Justice by voice vote |
2016-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket by voice vote |
2016-01-14 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil Law |
2015-12-30 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2015-12-30 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16102048D |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+sum+HB244 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+HB244+hil |