VA HB244 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 2 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 2 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Public utilities; cell phones; bill notice. Requires any public utility providing commercial mobile radio service to persons whose billing address is within the Commonwealth to include with each bill a notice stating: "It is unlawful for any person to text or use a handheld personal communications device while operating a motor vehicle in a highway work zone when workers are present." The measure also provides that, for purposes of the provision imposing such requirement, a provider of commercial mobile radio service is a public utility.
Title
Public utilities; cell phones, bill notice.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Left in Commerce and Labor |
2018-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-25 | House | Assigned C & L sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-01-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2018-01-02 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103203D |