VA HB246 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0123)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0123)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Local law-enforcement agencies; body-worn camera systems. Requires localities to adopt and establish a written policy for the operation of a body-worn camera system, as defined in the bill, that follows identified best practices and is consistent with Virginia law and regulations, using as guidance the model policy established by the Department of Criminal Justice Services prior to purchasing or deploying a body-worn camera system. The bill also requires localities to make such policy available for public comment and review prior to its adoption. The bill requires the Department to establish a model policy for the operation of body-worn camera systems and the storage and maintenance of body-worn camera system records.
Title
Law-enforcement agencies, local; body-worn camera systems.
Sponsors
Del. Mark Levine [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (36-Y 3-N) (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (62-Y 38-N) (Y: 62 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (62-Y 38-N) (Y: 62 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0123) | |
2020-03-04 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 123 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-02-26 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 4, 2020 | |
2020-02-26 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 26, 2020 |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-21 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-21 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB246ER) |
2020-02-21 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Passed Senate (36-Y 3-N) |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary (14-Y 1-N) |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-01-30 | House | VOTE: Passage (62-Y 38-N) |
2020-01-30 | House | Read third time and passed House (62-Y 38-N) |
2020-01-29 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-01-28 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-24 | House | Reported from Public Safety (14-Y 8-N) |
2020-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 2-N) |
2020-01-15 | House | Assigned PS sub: Public Safety |
2019-12-30 | House | Referred to Committee on Public Safety |
2019-12-30 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100997D |