VA HB249 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Communications, Technology and Innovation
Pending: House Communications, Technology and Innovation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Communications, Technology and Innovation
Pending: House Communications, Technology and Innovation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Criminal Justice Services; law-enforcement agencies; use of generative artificial intelligence and machine learning systems. Provides that the Department of Criminal Justice Services shall have the power and duty to establish a comprehensive framework for the use of generative artificial intelligence (AI) and machine learning systems, both defined in the bill, by law-enforcement agencies, which shall include (i) developing policies and procedures for the use of generative AI and machine learning systems in law-enforcement activities; (ii) establishing and publishing a model policy for the use of generative AI and machine learning systems to serve as a guideline for criminal justice agencies in the Commonwealth; and (iii) establishing compulsory minimum training standards for basic training and recertification of law-enforcement officers on the use of generative AI and machine learning systems. The bill provides that the Department shall establish and publish such model policy by January 1, 2025, and that all criminal justice agencies shall adopt a policy consistent with such model policy by July 1, 2025. The bill requires any person employed as a law-enforcement officer prior to July 1, 2024, to complete the training required by the bill by January 1, 2026.
Title
Law-enforcement agencies; use of generative artificial intelligence and machine learning systems.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | House | Left in Communications, Technology and Innovation |
2024-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2025 with amendment(s) by voice vote |
2024-01-26 | House | Assigned CT & I sub: Technology and Innovation |
2024-01-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Communications, Technology and Innovation |
2024-01-04 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24104171D |