VA HB254 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 2 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 2 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Human Resource Management; duties; employee communication regarding workplace issues. Requires the Department of Human Resource Management to establish a system of regular communication between managing employees and non-supervisory employees who are members of employee associations, labor unions, or labor organizations for the purpose of discussing workplace issues, consistent with the provisions of Chapter 4 (Labor Union, Strikes, Etc.) of Title 40.1 (Labor and Employment).
Title
DHRM; duties of department, employee communication.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Left in General Laws |
2018-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-19 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-01-02 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2018-01-02 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103733D |