VA HB256 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-09 - House: Passed by indefinitely in Transportation by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-09 - House: Passed by indefinitely in Transportation by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
HOV lanes; sunset clause. Extends the sunset clause on HOV lanes in Northern Virginia to 2013 and in Hampton Roads to 2017.
Title
HOV lanes; extends sunset clause in Northern Virginia and in Hampton Roads.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 0-N) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-19 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-19 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-19 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-19 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-09 | House: Passed by indefinitely in Transportation by voice vote | |
2012-02-07 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-23 | House: Assigned Transportation sub: #3 | |
2012-01-20 | House: Rereferred to Transportation | |
2012-01-20 | House: Motion to rerefer to committee agreed to | |
2012-01-20 | House: Read first time | |
2012-01-19 | House: Reported from Transportation with amendment (22-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-16 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-13 | House: Assigned Transportation sub: #1 | |
2012-01-10 | House: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2012-01-10 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12100886D |