VA HB256 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 2 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 2 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Individual income tax credit and property tax exemption for substantial-capacity solar equipment. Provides an individual income tax credit and a mandatory property tax exemption for substantial-capacity solar equipment. The bill defines "substantial-capacity solar equipment" and requires a taxpayer to obtain certification from his local building department that such equipment is eligible for exemption. Current law provides an exemption for a broader category of solar energy equipment, facilities, or devices; however, such exemption is permissive for localities and may be partial or full.
Title
Income tax, state, and property tax; exemption for substantial-capacity solar equipment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Left in Finance |
2018-02-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 3-N) |
2018-01-25 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2018-01-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2018-01-02 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103692D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
58 | 1 | 339.13 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 3660 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |