VA HB26 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - House sustained Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on April 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - House sustained Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Voter identification; accepted forms of identification; private entities licensed or certified by certain state agencies. Adds to the list of accepted forms of identification for purposes of voting a valid identification card that contains a photograph of the voter and is issued by any private entity that is licensed or certified, in whole or in part, by the Department of Health, Department of Social Services, Department of Medical Assistance Services, or Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services.
Title
Voter identification; accepted forms of identification, private entities licensed or certified.
Sponsors
Del. David Reid [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (21-Y 17-N) (Y: 21 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (85-Y 11-N) (Y: 85 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (85-Y 11-N) (Y: 85 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | House | House sustained Governor's veto |
2024-04-08 | Governor: Vetoed by Governor | |
2024-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-03-02 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-02-28 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-02-28 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB26ER) |
2024-02-28 | House | Enrolled |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Passed Senate (21-Y 17-N) |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections (10-Y 5-N) |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2024-02-09 | House | VOTE: Passage (85-Y 11-N) |
2024-02-09 | House | Read third time and passed House (85-Y 11-N) |
2024-02-08 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2024-02-07 | House | Passed by for the day |
2024-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-02 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections (19-Y 3-N) |
2024-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) |
2024-01-26 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Election Administration |
2023-12-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2023-12-18 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24100205D |