VA HB260 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0226)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0226)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Insurance; restitution. Authorizes the State Corporation Commission to require a person to make restitution in the amount of the direct actual financial loss if the person improperly withholds, misappropriates, or converts any money or property received in the course of conducting business. Currently, the Commission's authority to order restitution is limited to cases where an insurer charges an excessive rate or discriminatory premium or fails to pay undisputed amounts required under an insurance contract.
Title
Insurance; SCC to require person to make restitution if improperly withholds money.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-22 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-19 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-22 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-19 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-07 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0226) | |
2010-04-07 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 226 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-03-06 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-03 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-03 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB260ER) | |
2010-03-03 | House: Enrolled | |
2010-02-25 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-25 | Senate: Read third time | |
2010-02-24 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-22 | Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-25 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2010-01-25 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2010-01-22 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-22 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-21 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2010-01-20 | House: Read first time | |
2010-01-19 | House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2010-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10100732D |