VA HB262 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0580)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0580)
Summary
Housing loans and grants in designated conservation or rehabilitation districts. Grants authority to localities to make loans or grants of local funds to certain individuals for the purpose of rehabilitating owner-occupied residences or assisting in the purchase of an owner-occupied residence in designated conservation or rehabilitation districts.
Title
Housing loans and grants; localities to authorize in conservation or rehabilitation districts.
Sponsors
Del. Onzlee Ware [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0580) | |
2008-03-12 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 580 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-03-06 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-03-05 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-03-05 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB262ER) | |
2008-03-05 | House: Enrolled | |
2008-03-03 | Senate: Passed Senate (34-Y 6-N) | |
2008-03-03 | Senate: Read third time | |
2008-02-29 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2008-02-28 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-26 | Senate: Reported from Local Government (11-Y 4-N) | |
2008-02-13 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Local Government | |
2008-02-13 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2008-02-12 | House: Communicated to Senate | |
2008-02-12 | House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-12 | House: Read third time and passed House (99-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-11 | House: Printed as engrossed 082066776-EH1 | |
2008-02-11 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute with amendment HB262EH1 | |
2008-02-11 | House: Amendment by Delegate Ware, O. agreed to | |
2008-02-11 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 082066776-H1 | |
2008-02-11 | House: Read second time | |
2008-02-09 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-08 | House: Committee substitute printed 082066776-H1 | |
2008-02-08 | House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (22-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-02 | House: Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns | |
2008-01-02 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 081050776 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB262 |