VA HB262 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-22 - Senate: Failed to report (defeated) in Transportation (6-Y 6-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-22 - Senate: Failed to report (defeated) in Transportation (6-Y 6-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Commonwealth Transportation Board; membership. Changes the reference to "standard metropolitan statistical areas" to "metropolitan planning areas with populations greater than 200,000."
Title
Transportation Board; adds urban and rural at-large members.
Sponsors
Del. Betsy Carr [D] | Del. John Cox [R] | Sen. Jennifer McClellan [D] | Del. John O'Bannon [R] |
Del. Christopher Peace [R] | Sen. Scott Surovell [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Failed to report (defeated) in Transportation (6-Y 6-N) (Y: 6 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2013 in Transportation (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2013 in Transportation (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-22 | Senate: Failed to report (defeated) in Transportation (6-Y 6-N) | |
2012-02-22 | Senate: Reconsiderd by Transportation | |
2012-02-15 | Senate: Continued to 2013 in Transportation (14-Y 1-N) | |
2012-02-07 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2012-02-07 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2012-02-06 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-06 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-03 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB262H1 | |
2012-02-03 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 12104800D-H1 | |
2012-02-03 | House: Read second time | |
2012-02-02 | House: Read first time | |
2012-01-31 | House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-31 | House: Committee substitute printed 12104800D-H1 | |
2012-01-26 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-13 | House: Assigned Transportation sub: #4 | |
2012-01-10 | House: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2012-01-10 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12103411D |