VA HB262 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0121)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0121)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Local boards; appointment of members of boards of supervisors. Provides that in cases in which a member of a local board of social services is also a member of the board of supervisors of a county represented by the local board, he shall serve on the local board at the pleasure of the board of supervisors of which he is a member or until such time as he ceases to be a member of the board of supervisors.
Title
Local boards; appointment of members of boards of supervisors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-17 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-14 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-17 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-14 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-05 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0121) | |
2014-03-05 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 121 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-02-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-02-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-02-20 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB262ER) |
2014-02-20 | House | Enrolled |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (13-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-20 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2014-01-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-01-17 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-17 | House | Read third time and passed House (96-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-16 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2014-01-15 | House | Read first time |
2014-01-14 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 0-N) |
2013-12-30 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2013-12-30 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14102067D |
Same As/Similar To
SB316 (Same As) 2014-03-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0095)