VA HB264 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0122)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0122)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Authority of local boards of social services to employ in-house counsel. Authorizes local boards of social services to employ in-house counsel to provide general legal advice and representation related to specific actions.
Title
Social services, local boards of; authority to employ in-house counsel.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-24 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-24 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-05 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0122) | |
2014-03-05 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 122 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-02-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-02-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-02-20 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB264ER) |
2014-02-20 | House | Enrolled |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (13-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-01-24 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-24 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-23 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2014-01-22 | House | Read first time |
2014-01-21 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-09 | House | Assigned HWI sub: # 2 |
2013-12-30 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2013-12-30 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14102751D |
Same As/Similar To
SB417 (Same As) 2014-04-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0536)