VA HB270 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0073)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0073)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Plan for the vaccination of school children. Requires the Department of Health to include in its vaccination plans procedures to ensure the prompt vaccination of all persons of school age in the Commonwealth, without preference regarding the manner of compliance with the compulsory school attendance law, upon declaration of an emergency involving a vaccine-preventable disease and consent of the parent of the person of school age, or the person of school age if such person is not a minor. This bill also requires the plans developed be consistent with applicable guidelines developed by the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention and be subject to the same review and update requirements as the State Emergency Operations Plan.
Title
Vaccination of school children; Department of Health to develop plan for all students in State.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (96-Y 3-N) (Y: 98 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 3-N) (Y: 3 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (96-Y 3-N) (Y: 98 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 3-N) (Y: 3 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-09 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0073) | |
2010-03-09 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 73 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-02-25 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-02-24 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-02-24 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB270ER) | |
2010-02-24 | House: Enrolled | |
2010-02-22 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-22 | Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-22 | Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-22 | Senate: Read third time | |
2010-02-19 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-18 | Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-12 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Education and Health | |
2010-02-12 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2010-02-11 | House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (96-Y 3-N) | |
2010-02-11 | House: Read third time and passed House (96-Y 3-N) | |
2010-02-10 | House: Printed as engrossed 10104423D-EH1 | |
2010-02-10 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute with amendment HB270EH1 | |
2010-02-10 | House: Amendment by Delegate Englin agreed to | |
2010-02-10 | House: Read second time | |
2010-02-09 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2010-02-09 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 10104423D-H1 | |
2010-02-09 | House: Read second time | |
2010-02-08 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-04 | House: Committee substitute printed 10104423D-H1 | |
2010-02-04 | House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-01 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-25 | House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 3-N) | |
2010-01-15 | House: Assigned HWI sub: #1 | |
2010-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions | |
2010-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10101097D |