VA HB272 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-04 - House: Passed by in General Laws with letter by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-04 - House: Passed by in General Laws with letter by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Law-Enforcement Officers Procedural Guarantee Act; definition of law-enforcement officer. Includes certain employees of a sheriff's department under the coverage of the Law-Enforcement Officers Procedural Guarantee Act, so long as the employees would not be considered exempt employees for purposes of the federal Fair Labor Standards Act.
Title
Law-Enforcement Officers Procedural Guarantee Act; definition of law-enforcement officer.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-04 | House: Passed by in General Laws with letter by voice vote | |
2010-02-03 | House: Subcommittee recommends passing by with letter by voice vote | |
2010-01-15 | House: Assigned GL sub: #1 Housing | |
2010-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2010-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10101299D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+sum+HB272 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+ful+HB272+hil |