VA HB276 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB276
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-26 - Continued to 2025 in Privileges and Elections by voice vote
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-26 - Continued to 2025 in Privileges and Elections by voice vote
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Campaign advertisements; independent expenditures; electioneering communications; disclaimer requirements. Broadens the scope of disclaimer requirements for campaign advertisements to include electioneering communications, as defined in the bill, and messages advocating for the passage or defeat of a referendum. The bill also requires an advertisement that is an independent expenditure or that expressly advocates for the passage or defeat of a referendum to contain a disclaimer providing the names of the advertisement sponsor's three largest contributors. The bill also requires independent expenditure reports to be filed electronically. Current law allows such reports to be filed either electronically or in writing.
Title
Campaign advertisements; independent expenditures, electioneering communications.
Sponsors
Del. Dan Helmer [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-26 | House | Continued to 2025 in Privileges and Elections by voice vote |
2024-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) |
2024-01-16 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Campaign Finance |
2024-01-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2024-01-05 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24100939D |
Same As/Similar To
HB276 (Carry Over) 2024-01-26 - Continued to 2025 in Privileges and Elections by voice vote
SB78 (Similar To) 2024-02-12 - Read third time and defeated by Senate (19-Y 21-N)
SB78 (Similar To) 2024-02-12 - Read third time and defeated by Senate (19-Y 21-N)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
24 | 2 | 945.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 945.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 955 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 955.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 956 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 956.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 957.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 957.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 957.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 958.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 958.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 958.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |