VA HB280 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-11-30 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: Senate Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-11-30 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: Senate Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Correcting errors in deeds; affidavit. Allows, in the event that a recorded deed or other instrument contains an obvious description error, the recordation of a corrective affidavit by an attorney, settlement agent, or title insurance company involved in the transaction that resulted in the recordation of the deed or other instrument needing correction. Obvious description errors include (i) errors transcribing courses and distances, (ii) errors incorporating previously recorded plat or deed references, (iii) errors incorporating tax map or other identification numbers, and (iv) omitted exhibits that supply property parcel descriptions. Before a corrective affidavit may be recorded, all parties to the deed or other instrument and, if necessary, the title insurance company must be provided with a copy of the affidavit and such parties have 30 days to object in writing to the recordation of the corrective affidavit. If a corrective affidavit is recorded, the title insurance company shall amend the title insurance policy and deliver a copy of the amended policy to all parties to the policy.
Title
Deeds; affidavit by an attorney involved in transaction may be used in correcting errors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2013 in Courts of Justice (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Failed to report (defeated) in Courts of Justice (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Failed to report (defeated) in Courts of Justice (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-11-30 | Senate | Left in Courts of Justice |
2012-02-27 | Senate | Continued to 2013 in Courts of Justice (14-Y 1-N) |
2012-02-27 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 12105518D-S1 |
2012-02-23 | Senate | Reconsidered by Courts of Justice |
2012-02-20 | Senate | Failed to report (defeated) in Courts of Justice (8-Y 7-N) |
2012-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2012-01-30 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2012-01-27 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2012-01-27 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2012-01-26 | House | Printed as engrossed 12100339D-E |
2012-01-26 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB280E |
2012-01-26 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2012-01-26 | House | Read second time |
2012-01-25 | House | Read first time |
2012-01-23 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (18-Y 0-N) |
2012-01-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) |
2012-01-13 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil |
2012-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2012-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12100339D |