VA HB282 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-22 - House: Continued to 2011 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-22 - House: Continued to 2011 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Court approval of newspapers used for legal notices and publications. Provides that a newspaper may petition the circuit court for the jurisdiction in which the newspaper is located or circulated for the authority to publish ordinances, resolutions, notices, or advertisements.
Title
Newspapers; may petition circuit court for authority to publish legal notices and publications.
Sponsors
Del. David Albo [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-22 | House: Continued to 2011 in Courts of Justice by voice vote | |
2010-01-18 | House: Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2011 by voice vote | |
2010-01-15 | House: Assigned Courts sub: Civil | |
2010-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2010-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10101611D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+sum+HB282 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+ful+HB282+hil |