VA HB282 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Housing Development Authority Act; pilot program; home ownership; low income persons. Directs the Virginia Housing Development Authority to develop a pilot program providing support services, including counseling and financing assistance, to help low-income persons who are currently renters become home owners.
Title
VHDA Act; pilot program to help low-income persons who are currently renters become home owners.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Left in General Laws |
2018-01-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-17 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2018-01-03 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2018-01-03 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100825D |