VA HB286 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0409)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0409)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Previous garnishments; costs. Allows costs incurred by a judgment creditor in connection with a prior garnishment to be collected in a subsequent garnishment attempt that is based on the same judgment.
Title
Garnishment, previous; allows costs incurred by judgment creditor are chargeable to judgment debtor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (9-Y 4-N) (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (80-Y 19-N) (Y: 82 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (9-Y 4-N) (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (80-Y 19-N) (Y: 82 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-30 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0409) | |
2012-03-30 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 409 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-02-28 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-02-27 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-02-27 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB286ER) | |
2012-02-27 | House: Enrolled | |
2012-02-22 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-22 | House: Senate amendment agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-21 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-02-20 | Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-20 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended | |
2012-02-20 | Senate: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2012-02-20 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2012-02-20 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-02-17 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-15 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (9-Y 4-N) | |
2012-01-31 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2012-01-31 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2012-01-30 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE (80-Y 19-N) | |
2012-01-30 | House: Read third time and passed House (80-Y 19-N) | |
2012-01-27 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2012-01-26 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB286H1 | |
2012-01-26 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 12104123D-H1 | |
2012-01-26 | House: Read second time | |
2012-01-25 | House: Read first time | |
2012-01-23 | House: Committee substitute printed 12104123D-H1 | |
2012-01-23 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-16 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-13 | House: Assigned Courts sub: Civil | |
2012-01-10 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2012-01-10 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12100579D |
Same As/Similar To
SB561 (Same As) 2012-03-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0127)