VA HB294 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-16 - House: Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-16 - House: Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Menhaden fishery. Directs the Virginia Marine Resources Commission to adopt regulations to implement the Interstate Fishery Management Plan for Atlantic Menhaden. The bill also requires that any moratorium on the fishery be subject to legislative review and repeals the Governor's authority to implement menhaden management measures by proclamation.
Title
Menhaden fishery; Marine Resources Commission to adopt regulations.
Sponsors
Sen. John Cosgrove [R] | Del. Thomas Gear [R] | Del. Patrick Hope [D] | Del. Jackson Miller [R] |
Del. Harry Purkey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-16 | House: Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources | |
2010-01-28 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote | |
2010-01-20 | House: Assigned ACNRsub: #3 Chesapeake | |
2010-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources | |
2010-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10102175D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 4002 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 4103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
28 | 2 | 1000.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
28 | 2 | 1000.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
28 | 2 | 203.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
28 | 2 | 409 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
28 | 2 | 410 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+sum+HB294 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+ful+HB294+hil |