VA HB295 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-20 - Continued to 2019 in Local Government (7-Y 6-N)
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-20 - Continued to 2019 in Local Government (7-Y 6-N)
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Turns in certain residential areas in certain counties; resident stickers. Allows counties that operate under the urban county executive form of government (Fairfax County) by ordinance to develop a program to issue permits to residents of a designated area that will allow such residents to make turns into or out of the neighborhood during certain times of the day where such turns would otherwise be restricted.
Title
Resident stickers; turns in certain residential areas.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2019 in Local Government (7-Y 6-N) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 3-N) (Y: 96 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 3-N) (Y: 96 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-20 | Senate | Continued to 2019 in Local Government (7-Y 6-N) |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-02-08 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 3-N) |
2018-02-08 | House | Read third time and passed House (96-Y 3-N) |
2018-02-07 | House | Printed as engrossed 18103592D-E |
2018-02-07 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB295E |
2018-02-07 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2018-02-07 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-02 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment (20-Y 2-N) |
2018-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (7-Y 1-N) |
2018-01-16 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2018-01-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2018-01-03 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103592D |