VA HB298 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0212)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0212)
Summary
Surplus lines insurance; "diligent effort" requirement. Eliminates the requirement that surplus lines brokers make a diligent effort to procure insurance, in a form and at a premium acceptable to the insured, from an insurer licensed in Virginia before he provides a surplus lines policy.
Title
Surplus lines insurance; diligent effort requirement.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0212) | |
2008-03-03 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 212 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-02-26 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-02-25 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-02-25 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB298ER) | |
2008-02-25 | House: Enrolled | |
2008-02-21 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-21 | Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-21 | Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-21 | Senate: Read third time | |
2008-02-20 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-18 | Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-22 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2008-01-22 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2008-01-21 | House: Communicated to Senate | |
2008-01-21 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-21 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-18 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2008-01-17 | House: Read first time | |
2008-01-15 | House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-03 | House: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2008-01-03 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 088663532 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB298 |