VA HB306 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Display of advertising material on sides and rear of school buses. Permits local school boards to display advertising material on the sides and rear of school buses, provided that no such material obstructs the name of the school division or the number of the school bus or pertains to alcohol, gambling, or tobacco.
Title
School buses; display of advertising material on sides and rear.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-16 | House | Left in Education |
2016-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2016-01-15 | House | Assigned Education sub: Elementary and Secondary Education |
2016-01-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2016-01-04 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16101828D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+sum+HB306 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+HB306+hil |