VA HB307 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Alcoholic beverage control; exemptions from licensure; manufacture of spirits at personal residence for domestic consumption. Exempts from the licensure requirements of the Alcoholic Beverage Control Act any person who, after being granted a permit by the Board of Directors of the Virginia Alcoholic Beverage Control Authority to keep, store, or possess any still or distilling apparatus for the purpose of distilling alcohol, manufactures at his residence for domestic consumption spirits in an amount not to exceed (i) 100 gallons per year if there are two or more persons 21 years of age or older residing in the residence or (ii) 50 gallons per year if there is only one person 21 years of age or older residing in the residence.
Title
Alcoholic beverage control; exemption from licensure person who manufactures spirits at residence.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 5-N) (Y: 3 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | House | Left in General Laws |
2024-01-23 | House | Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 5-N) |
2024-01-15 | House | Assigned GL sub: ABC/Gaming |
2024-01-05 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2024-01-05 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24101762D |