VA HB311 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0079)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0079)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Emergency medical services providers; interstate agreements. Directs the Secretary of Health and Human Resources to undertake efforts to establish collaborative agreements with other states to allow emergency medical services providers to provide emergency medical services across state lines and to report to the General Assembly regarding the status of such efforts no later than November 1, 2016. The bill contains an emergency clause.
Title
Emergency medical services providers; interstate agreements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-01 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0079) | |
2016-03-01 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 79 (effective 3/1/16) | |
2016-02-25 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 3, 2016 | |
2016-02-25 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/25/16 |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-02-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-02-24 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB311ER) |
2016-02-24 | House | Enrolled |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Read third time |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2016-01-27 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-27 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-26 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2016-01-25 | House | Read first time |
2016-01-21 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2016-01-05 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 01/13/16 16100540D |