VA HB316 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-16 - House: Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-16 - House: Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Retirement System; general registrars. Permits a general registrar who (i) is involuntarily separated and (ii) has 20 or more years of creditable service to retire with an unreduced allowance upon attaining age 50.
Title
VRS; permits general registrars to retire with 20 years at an unreduced allowance at age 50.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-16 | House: Left in Appropriations | |
2010-01-28 | House: Subcommittee recommends no action by voice vote | |
2010-01-19 | House: Assigned App. sub: Compensation and Retirement | |
2010-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2010-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10102869D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+sum+HB316 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+ful+HB316+hil |