VA HB316 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0240)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0240)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Refunds of local taxes; authority of treasurer. Increases from $2,500 to $5,000 the maximum amount at which the governing body of a locality may authorize its treasurer to approve and issue a refund of taxes paid as a result of an erroneous tax assessment.
Title
Refunds of local taxes; authority of treasurer.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House: VOTE: Passage #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House: VOTE: Passage #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0240) | |
2020-03-10 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 240 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-03 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 10, 2020 | |
2020-03-03 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 3, 2020 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-25 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-25 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB316ER) |
2020-02-25 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-01-21 | House | VOTE: Passage #2 (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-21 | House | Passed House (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-21 | House | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House |
2020-01-21 | House | VOTE: Passage (98-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-21 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-20 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB316H1 |
2020-01-20 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20105801D-H1 |
2020-01-20 | House | Read second time |
2020-01-17 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-15 | House | Incorporates HB773 (LaRock) |
2020-01-15 | House | Committee substitute printed 20105801D-H1 |
2020-01-15 | House | Reported from Finance with substitute (21-Y 0-N) |
2019-12-31 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2019-12-31 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103353D |
Same As/Similar To
HB773 (Similar To) 2020-01-15 - Incorporated by Finance