VA HB316 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0574)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0574)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Independent dealer-operator recertification. Codifies existing Motor Vehicle Dealer Board regulations related to independent dealer-operator recertification and revises the process established by regulation by (i) requiring recertification every 24 months instead of every 36 months; (ii) changing the training requirement from completing a six-hour course to completing a live four-hour instructor-led course and passing an examination, administered in person or virtually; (iii) increasing the permissible course fee from $250 to $300; (iv) increasing the recertification application fee from $25 to $50; and (v) exempting from the requirements of clause (ii) independent dealer-operators who complete a training program approved by the Executive Director of the Motor Vehicle Dealer Board and administered by a dealer that employs at least 50 licensed salespersons in the Commonwealth. Independent dealer-operator recertification. Codifies existing Motor Vehicle Dealer Board regulations related to independent dealer-operator recertification and revises the process established by regulation by (i) requiring recertification every 24 months instead of every 36 months; (ii) changing the training requirement from completing a six-hour course to completing a live four-hour instructor-led course and passing an examination, administered in person or virtually; (iii) increasing the permissible course fee from $250 to $300; (iv) increasing the recertification application fee from $25 to $50; and (v) exempting from the requirements of clause (ii) independent dealer-operators who complete a training program approved by the Executive Director of the Motor Vehicle Dealer Board and administered by a dealer that employs at least 50 licensed salespersons in the Commonwealth.
Title
Independent dealer-operator recertification; codifies existing Motor Vehicle Dealer Bd. regulations.
Sponsors
Del. Scott Wyatt [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0574) | |
2022-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 574 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-09 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-09 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB316ER) |
2022-03-09 | House | Enrolled |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-02 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-02 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-01 | House | Printed as engrossed 22104116D-E |
2022-02-01 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB316E |
2022-02-01 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2022-02-01 | House | Read second time |
2022-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2022-01-27 | House | Reported from Transportation with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (10-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-18 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #1 Department of Motor Vehicles |
2022-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2022-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22104116D |