VA HB318 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Peer Recovery Support Fund. Establishes the Peer Recovery Support Fund (the Fund) to provide payment for the cost of peer-to-peer substance abuse recovery support services provided by individuals other than state or local government employees. The bill requires that 10 percent of the net profits of the Virginia Cannabis Control Authority derived from the sale of marijuana be appropriated to the Fund in the general appropriation act. The bill also directs the Board of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services to develop regulations setting forth criteria for payments for peer-to-peer substance abuse recovery support services provided by individuals other than state or local government employees from the Fund.
Title
Peer Recovery Support Fund; established.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2022-02-07 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-02 | House | Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources |
2022-02-01 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-02-01 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (18-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2022-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22101821D |