VA HB319 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0550)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0550)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Literacy Act; early student literacy; evidence-based literacy instruction; science-based reading research. Makes several changes relating to early student literacy, including requiring (i) each education preparation program offered by a public institution of higher education or private institution of higher education or alternative certification program that provides training for any individual seeking initial licensure with an endorsement in a certain area, including as a reading specialist, to demonstrate mastery of science-based reading research and evidence-based literacy instruction, as such terms are defined in the bill; (ii) the literacy assessment required of individuals seeking initial teacher licensure with endorsements in certain areas to include a rigorous test of science-based reading research and evidence-based literacy instruction; (iii) each local school board to establish a divisionwide literacy plan; (iv) each local school board to employ one reading specialist for each 550 students in kindergarten through grade three; and (v) each local school board to provide a program of literacy instruction whereby, among other things, (a) the program provides reading intervention services to students in kindergarten through grade three who demonstrate deficiencies based on their individual performance on the Standards of Learning reading assessment or an early literacy screener provided or approved by the Department of Education; (b) a reading specialist, in collaboration with the teacher of any student who receives such reading intervention services, develops, oversees implementation of, and monitors student progress on a student reading plan; and (c) each student who receives such reading intervention services is assessed utilizing either the early literacy screener provided or approved by the Department or the grade-level reading Standards of Learning assessment again at the end of that school year. The provisions of the bill become effective beginning with the 2024–2025 school year.
Title
Virginia Literacy Act; early student literacy, evidence-based literacy instruction, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Senate receded from amendment (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: Rejected (0-Y 98-N) (Y: 0 N: 98 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: Rejected (0-Y 98-N) (Y: 0 N: 98 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0550) | |
2022-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 550 (effective - see bill) | |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-11 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-11 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB319ER) |
2022-03-11 | House | Enrolled |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Senate receded from amendment (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2022-03-07 | House | VOTE: Rejected (0-Y 98-N) |
2022-03-07 | House | Senate amendment rejected by House (0-Y 98-N) |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-11 | House | VOTE: Passage (97-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-11 | House | Read third time and passed House (97-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-10 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB319H1 |
2022-02-10 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 22104625D-H1 |
2022-02-10 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-07 | House | Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-07 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-31 | House | Assigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education |
2022-01-31 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-01-31 | House | Committee substitute printed 22104625D-H1 |
2022-01-31 | House | Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-01-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-19 | House | Assigned Education sub: Early Childhood/Innovation |
2022-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2022-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22103787D |
Same As/Similar To
SB616 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0549)
SB616 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0549)
SB616 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0549)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
22 | 1 | 1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 253.13:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 253.13:2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 253.13:5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 253.13:6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 298.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 902.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |