VA HB320 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-21 - House: Incorporated by Transportation (HB214-Greason) by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-21 - House: Incorporated by Transportation (HB214-Greason) by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
HOV lanes; use by vehicle with clean special fuel license plates. Extends until July 1, 2011, the sunset on use of HOV lanes by clean special fuel vehicles, regardless of the number of occupants. This bill was incorporated into
Title
HOV lanes; extends date for use by vehicle with clean special fuel license plates.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-21 | House: Incorporated by Transportation (HB214-Greason) by voice vote | |
2010-01-19 | House: Subcommittee recommends incorporating (HB214-Greason) by voice vote | |
2010-01-15 | House: Assigned Transportation sub: #3 | |
2010-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2010-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10102192D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+sum+HB320 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+ful+HB320+hil |