VA HB326 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0690)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0690)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Social Work Licensure Compact. Authorizes Virginia to become a signatory to the Social Work Licensure Compact. The Compact allows social workers who have or are eligible for an active, unencumbered license in the compact member state where they reside to apply for a multistate license. After verifying eligibility, the social worker is granted a multistate license that authorizes practice in all other compact member states. The Compact takes effect when it is enacted by a seventh member state.
Title
Social Work Licensure Compact; authorizes Virginia to become a signatory to Compact.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (26-Y 14-N) (Y: 26 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (12-Y 2-N) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (10-Y 4-N) (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Privileges and Elections (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (86-Y 13-N) (Y: 86 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Health and Human Services (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment(s) (14-Y 5-N) (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (12-Y 2-N) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (10-Y 4-N) (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Privileges and Elections (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (86-Y 13-N) (Y: 86 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Health and Human Services (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment(s) (14-Y 5-N) (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0690) | |
2024-04-08 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 690 (effective - see bill) | |
2024-03-27 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-27 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 27, 2024 |
2024-03-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-03-25 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB326ER) |
2024-03-25 | House | Enrolled |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Passed Senate (26-Y 14-N) |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (12-Y 2-N) |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (10-Y 4-N) |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Rereferred to Education and Health |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Rereferred from Privileges and Elections (13-Y 1-N) |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2024-02-13 | House | VOTE: Passage (86-Y 13-N) |
2024-02-13 | House | Read third time and passed House (86-Y 13-N) |
2024-02-12 | House | Printed as engrossed 24101350D-E |
2024-02-12 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB326E |
2024-02-12 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2024-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-11 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-08 | House | Reported from Health and Human Services (22-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2024-02-06 | House | Reported from General Laws with amendment(s) (14-Y 5-N) |
2024-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2024-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-26 | House | Assigned GL sub: Professions/Occupations and Administrative Process |
2024-01-05 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2024-01-05 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24101350D |
Same As/Similar To
SB239 (Similar To) 2024-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0704)