VA HB332 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
State employee health insurance plan; coverage for proton therapy. Requires the state employee health insurance plan to include coverage for proton therapy. The measure provides that the plan shall cover a physician-prescribed hypofractionated proton therapy protocol to deliver a biological effective dose for a particular indication by paying the same aggregate amount as would be paid for the delivery of the same biological effective dose with IMRT for the same indication, provided that the eligible patient is treated as part of a clinical trial or registry.
Title
State employee health insurance plan; coverage for proton therapy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2018-02-08 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (7-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-19 | House | Assigned App. sub: Compensation & Retirement |
2018-01-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-01-04 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102920D |