VA HB335 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - House sustained Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on April 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - House sustained Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Labor and Industry; tipped employee wages; work group. Directs the Department of Labor and Industry to convene a work group to study (i) options for increasing tipped employee minimum cash wages, (ii) circumstances related to wage theft or payment inequities by employers of tipped wage employees, and (iii) amending the penalty provisions related to employee remedies and employer penalties for violations of minimum wage requirements. The bill directs the work group to submit a report of its findings no later than December 1, 2024. Department of Labor and Industry; tipped employee wages; work group. Directs the Department of Labor and Industry to convene a work group to study (i) options for increasing tipped employee minimum cash wages, (ii) circumstances related to wage theft or payment inequities by employers of tipped wage employees, and (iii) amending the penalty provisions related to employee remedies and employer penalties for violations of minimum wage requirements. The bill directs the work group to submit a report of its findings no later than December 1, 2024.
Title
Tipped employees; DOLI to study increasing wages and address wage theft by employers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (51-Y 47-N) (Y: 51 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (20-Y 19-N) (Y: 20 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (49-Y 47-N) (Y: 49 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (12-Y 9-N) (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (20-Y 19-N) (Y: 20 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (49-Y 47-N) (Y: 49 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (12-Y 9-N) (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | House | House sustained Governor's veto |
2024-04-08 | Governor: Vetoed by Governor | |
2024-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB335ER) |
2024-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2024-03-04 | House | VOTE: Adoption (51-Y 47-N) |
2024-03-04 | House | Senate amendments agreed to by House (51-Y 47-N) |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments (20-Y 19-N) |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (9-Y 6-N) |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2024-02-08 | House | VOTE: Passage (49-Y 47-N) |
2024-02-08 | House | Read third time and passed House (49-Y 47-N) |
2024-02-07 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB335H2 |
2024-02-07 | House | Committee on Appropriations substitute agreed to 24106660D-H2 |
2024-02-07 | House | Committee on Labor and Commerce substitute rejected 24105102D-H1 |
2024-02-07 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-02 | House | Committee substitute printed 24106660D-H2 |
2024-02-02 | House | Reported from Appropriations with substitute (12-Y 10-N) |
2024-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) |
2024-01-24 | House | Assigned App. sub: Commerce Agriculture & Natural Resources |
2024-01-23 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-01-23 | House | Committee substitute printed 24105102D-H1 |
2024-01-23 | House | Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (12-Y 9-N) |
2024-01-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) |
2024-01-15 | House | Assigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2024-01-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2024-01-05 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24103798D |