VA HB336 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0198)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0198)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Commercial liability insurance and medical malpractice joint underwriting associations. Updates the insurance company trade associations that are authorized to appoint directors to the Medical Malpractice Joint Underwriting Association and the Commercial Liability Joint Underwriting Association if there is a need for either of the associations to be activated. References to (i) Alliance of American Insurers are changed to Property Casualty Insurers Association of America and (ii) National Association of Independent Insurers are changed to National Association of Mutual Insurance Companies.
Title
Insurance joint underwriting associations; board of directors.
Sponsors
Del. Robert Bell [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-16 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-16 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-07 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0198) | |
2014-03-07 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 198 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-02-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-02-24 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB336ER) |
2014-02-24 | House | Enrolled |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (16-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-01-22 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-22 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-21 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB336H1 |
2014-01-21 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 14103992D-H1 |
2014-01-21 | House | Read second time |
2014-01-20 | House | Read first time |
2014-01-16 | House | Committee substitute printed 14103992D-H1 |
2014-01-16 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (21-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-15 | House | Assigned C & L sub: Special Subcommittee on Energy |
2014-01-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2014-01-02 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14101872D |