VA HB341 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0064)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0064)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Natural gas vehicles; weight limit exception. Allows vehicles fueled, wholly or partially, by natural gas to weigh up to 2,000 pounds more than the applicable weight limit on non-Interstate highways. The bill requires the operator of the vehicle to be able to demonstrate that the vehicle uses natural gas.
Title
Natural gas vehicles; weight limit exception, allowance for Interstate highways.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 5-N) (Y: 92 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendment (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 5-N) (Y: 92 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendment (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-03 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0064) | |
2014-03-03 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 64 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-02-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-02-19 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB341ER) |
2014-02-19 | House | Enrolled |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-01-31 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 5-N) |
2014-01-31 | House | Read third time and passed House (90-Y 5-N) |
2014-01-30 | House | Printed as engrossed 14102558D-E |
2014-01-30 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB341E |
2014-01-30 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2014-01-30 | House | Read second time |
2014-01-29 | House | Read first time |
2014-01-28 | House | Reported from Transportation with amendment (19-Y 3-N) |
2014-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 1-N) |
2014-01-10 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2014-01-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2014-01-02 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14102558D |