VA HB341 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Cluster development; open space; stormwater management area. Allows a locality to prohibit a stormwater management area from being located in an "open space" or "conservation area" established as part of a cluster development. Current law bars localities from enacting such a prohibition.
Title
Cluster development; open space, stormwater management area.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Left in Counties, Cities and Towns |
2018-02-07 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-16 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2018-01-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2018-01-04 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103134D |