VA HB341 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-01 - Incorporated by General Laws
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-01 - Incorporated by General Laws
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Public Procurement Act; consideration of employment of older Virginia residents. Allows public bodies to include as a factor that will be used in evaluating a Request for Proposal the proposer's participation in programs that employ Virginia residents age 55 or older. The bill also provides that in the case of a tie bid between two or more bidders-both of which are eligible for a preference as a bidder for goods produced in Virginia or goods, services, or construction provided by Virginia persons, firms, or corporations-an additional preference shall be given to any bidder that participates in such programs.
Title
Virginia Public Procurement Act; consideration of employment of older Virginia residents.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-01 | House | Incorporated by General Laws |
2024-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends incorporating (HB1361-Feggans) by voice vote |
2024-01-26 | House | Assigned GL sub: Procurement/Open Government |
2024-01-05 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2024-01-05 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24103083D |