VA HB342 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-01-31 - House: Incorporated by Transportation (HB1014-Hugo) by voice vote
Status: Introduced on January 4 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-01-31 - House: Incorporated by Transportation (HB1014-Hugo) by voice vote
Summary
HOV lanes; use by vehicles bearing clean special fuel vehicle license plates. Extends the July 1, 2008, "sunset" on use of HOV lanes by vehicles bearing clean special fuel vehicle license plates, regardless of the number of their passengers, until July 1, 2012. This bill was incorporated into
Title
High-occupancy vehicle (HOV) lanes; use by vehicles bearing special fuel vehicle license plates.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-01-31 | House: Incorporated by Transportation (HB1014-Hugo) by voice vote | |
2008-01-14 | House: Assigned Transportation sub: 1 | |
2008-01-04 | House: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2008-01-04 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 088639684 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB342 |