VA HB343 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 22 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-02-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0012)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 22 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-02-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0012)
Summary
Cathode ray tubes; disposal bans. Permits localities to prohibit the disposal of cathode ray tubes in any waste-to-energy or solid waste disposal facility within its jurisdiction, provided the locality has implemented a recycling program that is capable of handling all cathode ray tubes generated within its jurisdiction. Previously the ban only applied to privately operated landfills.
Title
Cathode ray tubes; disposal bans.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-02-25 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0012) | |
2008-02-22 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 12 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-02-15 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-02-15 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-02-15 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB343ER) | |
2008-02-15 | House: Enrolled | |
2008-02-13 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-13 | Senate: Read third time | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-11 | Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-22 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources | |
2008-01-22 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2008-01-21 | House: Communicated to Senate | |
2008-01-21 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-21 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-18 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2008-01-17 | House: Read first time | |
2008-01-16 | House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-04 | House: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources | |
2008-01-04 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 085653868 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB343 |