VA HB343 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0085)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0085)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Nursing homes; reimbursement of unexpended patient funds. Requires the Board of Health to include in its regulations a provision requiring nursing homes to provide a full refund of any unexpended patient funds on deposit with the facility following the discharge or death of a patient other than entrance-related fees paid to a continuing care provider within 30 days of a written request for such funds by the discharged patient or, in the case of the death of a patient, the person administering the patient's estate in accordance with the Virginia Small Estates Act (§ 64.2-600 et seq. of the Code of Virginia).
Title
Nursing homes; reimbursement of unexpended patient funds within 30 days of written request.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Rehabilitation and Social Services (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Rehabilitation and Social Services (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-01 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0085) | |
2016-03-01 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 85 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-02-25 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 3, 2016 | |
2016-02-25 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/25/16 |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-02-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-02-24 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB343ER) |
2016-02-24 | House | Enrolled |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Committee amendment rejected |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Read third time |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Rereferred to Education and Health |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Rereferred from Rehabilitation and Social Services (10-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2016-02-02 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-02 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-01 | House | Printed as engrossed 16101105D-E |
2016-02-01 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB343E |
2016-02-01 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2016-02-01 | House | Read second time |
2016-01-29 | House | Read first time |
2016-01-28 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-14 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2016-01-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2016-01-05 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16101105D |