VA HB348 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Governor's Development Opportunity Fund; eligibility for grants. Expands eligibility for grants from the Governor's Development Opportunity Fund to include counties or cities in which at least 40 percent of the assessed value of all real estate situated in the locality is exempt from local property taxation pursuant to federal law or Article X, Section 6 or 6-A of the Constitution of Virginia.
Title
Governor's Development Opportunity Fund; expands eligibility for grants.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-12 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2014-02-05 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2014-01-31 | House | Assigned App. sub: Agriculture, Commerce, Technology and Natural Resources |
2014-01-31 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2014-01-31 | House | Referred from General Laws by voice vote |
2014-01-03 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2014-01-03 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14102526D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+sum+HB348 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+ful+HB348+hil |