VA HB348 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 1 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 1 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Health insurance; authorization of drug prescribed by psychiatrist. Requires that any provider contract between a carrier and a participating health care provider with prescriptive authority, or its contracting agent, provide that no prior authorization is required for any drug prescribed by a psychiatrist, if (i) the drug is a covered benefit, (ii) the prescription does not exceed the FDA-labeled dosages, and (iii) the drug is prescribed consistent with the regulations of the Board of Medicine.
Title
Health insurance; authorization of drug prescribed by psychiatrist.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with amendments (15-Y 1-N) (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with amendments (15-Y 1-N) (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2020-02-07 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 1-N) |
2020-02-05 | House | Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources |
2020-02-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-02-04 | House | Reported from Labor and Commerce with amendments (15-Y 1-N) |
2020-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-14 | House | Assigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2020-01-01 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2020-01-01 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103588D |