VA HB353 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-02-01 - House: Incorporated by Privileges and Elections (HB359-Cole) by voice vote
Status: Introduced on January 4 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-02-01 - House: Incorporated by Privileges and Elections (HB359-Cole) by voice vote
Summary
Reporting certain designated campaign contributions. Requires political action committees, out-of-state political committees and federal political action committees to report contributions they receive that are designated for the election of a particular candidate. Such committees will be required to provide a candidate's campaign committee with information regarding the contributor of the designated contribution so that the candidate can identify that contribution on his or her campaign finance report. In turn, candidate campaign committees will be required to report designated contributions transmitted from such committees as being made by the person who designated the contribution. The act will become effective on January 1, 2009. This bill has been incorporated into
Title
Campaign finance; reporting certain designated contributions.
Sponsors
Del. Mark Cole [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-02-01 | House: Incorporated by Privileges and Elections (HB359-Cole) by voice vote | |
2008-01-11 | House: Assigned P & E sub: Finance | |
2008-01-04 | House: Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections | |
2008-01-04 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 085017468 |
Same As/Similar To
HB359 (Similar To) 2010-02-10 - House: Stricken at request of Patron in Finance by voice vote
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB353 |