VA HB353 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Supreme Court of Virginia; judicial caseloads; weighted caseload system. Requires the Supreme Court to develop a weighted caseload system to assess judicial caseloads throughout the Commonwealth, and using that system, requires the Court to determine the need for judicial positions and the optimum distribution of judicial positions throughout the Commonwealth and to report every 10 years on the number of judges needed within the circuits and districts.
Title
Judicial caseloads; weighted caseload system.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-12 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2014-01-15 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2014-01-10 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil |
2014-01-03 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2014-01-03 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14100936D |
Subjects
Courts of Record
Judges, Justices, and Other Elective Officers
Study Commissions, Committees, and Reports
Judges, Justices, and Other Elective Officers
Study Commissions, Committees, and Reports
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+sum+HB353 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+ful+HB353+hil |