VA HB354 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - House sustained Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on April 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - House sustained Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Public pools; regulations. Directs the Board of Health to adopt regulations governing swimming pools and other water recreational facilities operated for public use, including swimming pools and other water recreational facilities operated in conjunction with a tourist facility or health spa.
Title
Public pools; Board of Health to adopt regulations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (21-Y 18-N) (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (8-Y 6-N 1-A) (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 45-N) (Y: 55 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Health and Human Services (15-Y 7-N) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (8-Y 6-N 1-A) (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 45-N) (Y: 55 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Health and Human Services (15-Y 7-N) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | House | House sustained Governor's veto |
2024-04-08 | Governor: Vetoed by Governor | |
2024-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-03-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-02-29 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-02-29 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB354ER) |
2024-02-29 | House | Enrolled |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Passed Senate (21-Y 18-N) |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (8-Y 6-N 1-A) |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Assigned Education and Health Sub: Health |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2024-02-07 | House | VOTE: Passage (55-Y 45-N) |
2024-02-07 | House | Read third time and passed House (55-Y 45-N) |
2024-02-06 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2024-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-01 | House | Reported from Health and Human Services (15-Y 7-N) |
2024-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) |
2024-01-17 | House | Assigned sub: Health |
2024-01-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2024-01-05 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24100851D |