VA HB363 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Electric utility regulation; approval of generation facilities. Requires the State Corporation Commission, in its consideration of an application for approval of an electrical generation facility, to consider environmental effects not expressly governed by a permit or expressly considered by a permitting authority, including carbon emissions and the overall impacts of new and existing facilities on the health and welfare of the residents of the Commonwealth. The measure also removes provisions that prohibited the Commission from imposing additional conditions with respect to such matters.
Title
Electric utility regulation; approval of generation facilities.
Sponsors
Del. Kaye Kory [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-12 | House | Left in Commerce and Labor |
2014-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2014-01-16 | House | Assigned C & L sub: Special Subcommittee on Energy |
2014-01-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2014-01-03 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14101744D |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+sum+HB363 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+ful+HB363+hil |