VA HB363 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Sexual orientation change efforts prohibited. Prohibits any health care provider or person who performs counseling as part of his training for any profession licensed by a regulatory board of the Department of Health Professions from engaging in sexual orientation change efforts with any person under 18 years of age. The bill defines "sexual orientation change efforts" as any practice or treatment that seeks to change an individual's sexual orientation or gender identity, including efforts to change behaviors or gender expressions or to eliminate or reduce sexual or romantic attractions or feelings toward individuals of the same gender. "Sexual orientation change efforts" does not include counseling that provides assistance to a person undergoing gender transition or counseling that provides acceptance, support, and understanding of a person or facilitates a person's coping, social support, and identity exploration and development, including sexual-orientation-neutral interventions to prevent or address unlawful conduct or unsafe sexual practices, as long as such counseling does not seek to change an individual's sexual orientation or gender identity. The bill provides that no state funds shall be expended for the purpose of conducting sexual orientation change efforts, referring a person for sexual orientation change efforts, extending health benefits coverage for sexual orientation change efforts, or awarding a grant or contract to any entity that conducts sexual orientation change efforts or refers individuals for sexual orientation change efforts.
Title
Sexual orientation change efforts; prohibited as training for certain health care providers, etc.
Sponsors
Del. Patrick Hope [D] | Del. Betsy Carr [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2018-02-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (4-Y 2-N) |
2018-01-25 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2018-01-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2018-01-05 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100457D |