VA HB363 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 2 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 2 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
State subsidy of property tax exemptions for disabled veterans and surviving spouses. Requires the Commonwealth to subsidize local real estate tax relief for disabled veterans and surviving spouses of members of the armed forces killed in action when more than one percent of a locality's real estate tax base is lost due to such state-mandated tax relief programs. The Commonwealth would subsidize only that portion of tax exempt real estate that exceeds the one percent threshold.
Title
Disabled veterans and surviving spouses; state subsidy of property tax exemptions.
Sponsors
Del. Mark Cole [R] | Del. John Avoli [R] | Del. Joshua Cole [D] | Del. Wendell Walker [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Finance (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Finance (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Finance (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Finance (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Finance (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2020-02-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-02-05 | House | Reported from Finance (19-Y 3-N) |
2020-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-29 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2020-01-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2020-01-02 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103269D |